THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:43:59 AM
Smith, Crystal Anne
CPSO#:
71747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-6633 Highway 7 E
Markham ON L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-3374
Fax: (905) 472-3116
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRYSTAL ANNE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2006 |