THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:01:14 PM
Wales, Paul William
CPSO#:
71739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Oct 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3333 Burnet Ave
Cincinnati Children's Hospital Medi
General and Thoracic Surgery
MLC 2023
Cincinnati OH 45229-3026
United States
Phone: 5138030134
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:12 Oct 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL WILLIAM WALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 7 - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2002 |