THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:10:55 AM
Grise, Mary Eleanor
CPSO#:
71734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
One Kids Place
400 McKeown Ave.
North Bay ON P1B 0B2
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY ELEANOR GRISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRISE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2001 |