THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:42:23 PM
Khong, Ngoc Thi Bich
CPSO#:
71733
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto ON M9N 3Z9
Phone: (416) 240-0777
Fax: (416) 240-7228
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jul 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NGOC THI BICH KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2000 |