THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:55:21 PM
Chapman, Martin Giles
CPSO#:
71701
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Southampton, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Ctre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 1708
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:10 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN GILES CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2007 |