THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:23:29 PM
Dufour, Daniel Mark
CPSO#:
71678
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
111-100 Strowger Blvd
Brockville ON K6V 5J9
Phone: 613-345-0918
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL MARK DUFOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFOUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1999 |