THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:42:30 AM
Mohammed, Adam Hamde
CPSO#:
71669
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Eritrean
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 3A8
Phone: 905-281-8253
Fax: 905-281-9873
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:25 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM HAMDE MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1997 |