THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:35:52 AM
Banerjee, Probuddha Joy
CPSO#:
71640
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. x2437
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P. J. Banerjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PROBUDDHA JOY BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 02 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1999 |