THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:38:04 PM
Oliver, Sarah Jean
CPSO#:
71638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
U of Ottawa Family Health Team
University of Ottawa
100 Marie Curie Suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH JEAN OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 01 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 21 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 May 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2001 |