THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:10:42 PM
Rosen-Zaidener, Dalia Sharon
CPSO#:
71634
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 19569 Manulife PO
Toronto ON M4W3T9
Phone: (905) 773-3884
Fax: 905-597-9282
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON
M6B 3Z4
Tel: (416) 781-9083 or (888) 781-9083
Date Received: 23 Jan 2008
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALIA SHARON ROSEN-ZAIDENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN-ZAIDENER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |