THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:59:57 AM
Perry, Jeffrey Joseph
CPSO#:
71614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Mar 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Center
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOSEPH PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 1997 to 09 Oct 1997
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Oct 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1999 |