THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:58:21 PM
Pittman, Carole Dianne
CPSO#:
71610
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Phone: 519-749-4379
Fax: 519-894-8348
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLE DIANNE PITTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITTMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2002 |