THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:37:48 AM
Carpenter, Jenn Leslie
CPSO#:
71601
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Orthopedic and Pain
800 John Marks Ave
K7K0J7
Kingston ON K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Tanzania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENN LESLIE CARPENTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARPENTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |