THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:13:03 PM
Swain, Gordon Jerome
CPSO#:
71600
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gordon J. Swain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON
L1G 2B9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |