THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:50:29 AM
Kaila, Sanjeev
CPSO#:
71599
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjeev Kaila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: April 19, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 26, 2013, Bluewater Health notified the College that Dr. Sanjeev Kaila's privileges were revoked, effective April 19, 2013. On August 18, 2014, on agreement between the parties, the Health Professions Procedural Board set aside Bluewater Health's decision to revoke Dr. Kaila's appointment/privileges as Dr. Kaila no longer fulfilled the residency/practice requirements and was not eligible to maintain his appointment/privileges.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 11, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 15, 2012, Bluewater Health notified the College that Dr. Sanjeev Kaila's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective May 11, 2012.
On April 23, 2014, the Health Professions Procedural Board reinstated Dr. Kaila's privileges subject to conditions.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 18, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kaila has not practiced medicine in Ontario since November 2012.
Dr. Kaila was the subject of investigations by the College both with respect to his care and treatment of patients and his conduct.
In the face of these investigations, Dr. Kaila resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario. No referral has been made to the Discipline Committee of the College with respect to these investigations; the investigations were not the subject of any findings by the Discipline Committee.