THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:03:15 AM
Naidoo, Denisha
CPSO#:
71561
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Stone Rd E
Guelph ON N1G 2W1
Phone: 5198244120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 5198212308
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Denisha Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 21 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENISHA NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 21 Jun 1997 to 23 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |