THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:52:32 AM
Nowak, Justyna Maria Monica
CPSO#:
71536
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
804 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 507-7003
Fax: (613) 507-7006
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Nowak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUSTYNA MARIA MONICA NOWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2001 |