THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:57:41 PM
Teixeira, Fernando Jose
CPSO#:
71526
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Teixeira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Portugal
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FERNANDO JOSE TEIXEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEIXEIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2003 |