THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:02:12 AM
Butt, Shehbaz Ali
CPSO#:
71523
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
12 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Jul-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shehbaz Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2010
Corporation Name: Shehbaz Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 12 Jul 2018 |