THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:49:33 PM
Murphy, Johanna Margaret
CPSO#:
71473
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University Etherington Hall
Room 1008
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: 613 533 2056
Fax: 613 533 6654
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHANNA MARGARET MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2008 |