THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:52:40 PM
Palencar, Adriana
CPSO#:
71469
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Palencar-Frost, Adriana (used until: 20 Mar 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: (905) 373-6933
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIANA PALENCAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALENCAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1999 |