THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:24:43 PM
Eino, Dalia Mahmoud
CPSO#:
71448
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
118 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 2G6
Phone: (905) 627-4975
Fax: (905) 627-7553
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALIA MAHMOUD EINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EINO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2002 |