THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:59:09 PM
Randazzo, Mary Elizabeth
CPSO#:
71434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Parkview Rd
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Anson General Hospital |
Iroquois Falls |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. |
Mattawa |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH RANDAZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDAZZO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2007 |