THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:23:58 PM
Grimmer, Joanne
CPSO#:
71420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital-LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8379
Fax: (519) 685-8049
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNE GRIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2002 |