THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:34:58 AM
Dick, Alexander James
CPSO#:
71417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Feb 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Feb 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Division Of Cardiology
Room H 3408A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7332
Fax: (613) 696-7128
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alexander Dick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:13 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JAMES DICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2003 |