THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:59:26 AM
Chow, Barry L.
CPSO#:
71380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A 13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY L. CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 02 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1999 |