THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:04:21 AM
Shenker, Robert Lee
CPSO#:
71370
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Albert Street
Waterloo ON N2L 3S2
Phone: (519) 746-1132
Fax: (519) 746-0316
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT LEE SHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2004 |