THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:07:52 AM
Lee, Warren Lester
CPSO#:
71364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Room 613, Li Ka Shing
Critical Care Department
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77655
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WARREN LESTER LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |