THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:11:53 PM
Zahariadis, George
CPSO#:
71359
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Forest Rd
Room 271B, Dr.. L.A. Miller Center
Office of the Director and Chief
Public Health and Microbiology
St. John's NL A1A 3Z9
Phone: 709 777 7233
Fax: 709 777 7070
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: George Zahariadis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE ZAHARIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHARIADIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |