THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:18:04 AM
O'Beirne, Carole Patricia
CPSO#:
71351
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLE PATRICIA O'BEIRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BEIRNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2002 |