THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:28:13 PM
Grant, Kevin Mathew
CPSO#:
71324
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Ave East
Medical Mall
Scarborough General Hospital
Toronto ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (647) 352-8100
Fax: (647) 352-8200
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN MATHEW GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2003 |