THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:56:07 PM
Lau, Timothy Edwin
CPSO#:
71310
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY EDWIN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |