THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:07:45 PM
Lam, Buu-Khanh
CPSO#:
71258
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Vietnamese
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street Room H3404a
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7293
Fax: 613 696-7118
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BUU-KHANH LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 11 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2003 |