THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:22:31 AM
Shahparaki, Aram
CPSO#:
71243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Apr 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Ottawa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1411 Bewicke Ave
North Vancouver BC V7M 3C7
Phone: (604) 770-4264
Fax: (604) 770-4265
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARAM SHAHPARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHPARAKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2006 |