THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:18:11 PM
Pasion, Stella Rodriguez
CPSO#:
71223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20 Shelldale Cres
Guelph ON N1H 1C8
Phone: 5198216638
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STELLA RODRIGUEZ PASION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASION is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2000 |