THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:13:03 AM
Malcolm, Janine Charisse
CPSO#:
71201
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81945
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Jan 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANINE CHARISSE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2002 |