THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:02:53 AM
Faraj, Khaled Mabruk
CPSO#:
71190
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
29 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Khaled M. Faraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2009
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for copy of their medical records should e-mail Dr. Faraj at [email protected].
Date Received: 25 Sep 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:16 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 May 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2008 |