THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:48:45 AM
Bovett, Geoffrey Patrick
CPSO#:
71171
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bovett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Mar 2023 |