THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:04:51 AM
Oliverio, Paolo
CPSO#:
71166
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-545 Niagara St
Welland ON L3C 1L7
Phone: 289 820 5222
Fax: 289 820 5656
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Paolo Oliverio may make a written request to:
1-545 Niagara St
Welland ON L3C 1L7
Phone number: (289) 820-5222
Fax number: (289) 820-5656
Date Received: 08 Feb 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAOLO OLIVERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVERIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2010 |