THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:16:03 AM
Bouttell, Elaine Sarah
CPSO#:
71158
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 6596
Fax: 905-952-2818
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E. S. Bouttell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELAINE SARAH BOUTTELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUTTELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2007 |