THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:37:26 PM
Bobba, Raja Sekhar
CPSO#:
71153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610-25 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 308-8319
Fax: (905) 523-8466
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJA SEKHAR BOBBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOBBA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 12 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2002 to 12 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2003 |