THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:34:02 AM
Payne, Kira Louise
CPSO#:
71152
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-Jan-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Payne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2014 |