THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:38:17 PM
Inch, Cameron James Arthur
CPSO#:
71145
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2682 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1K2S3
Phone: (416) 269-6800
Fax: (416) 269-8317
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAMERON JAMES ARTHUR INCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1999 |