THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:16:47 AM
Khan, Yasser Anwar
CPSO#:
71133
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
438 Iroquois Shore Road
Bldg C, Unit 1-6
Oakville ON L5H 0X7
Phone: (905) 822-2020
Fax: (905) 822-3030
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASSER ANWAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2021 |