THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:27:01 PM
Piliotis, Eugenia
CPSO#:
71122
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 King St W
Kingston General Hospital
Oncology
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 6694
Fax: 613-548-2470
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EUGENIA PILIOTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILIOTIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2001 |