THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:37:40 AM
Segal, Galit Reichard
CPSO#:
71114
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Reichard Segal, Galit (used until: 11 Oct 1999 )
Reichard, Galit (used until: 19 Aug 1999 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON L4J 6X6
Phone: (905) 881-3984
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GALIT REICHARD SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |