THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:18:56 AM
Juvshik, Alexander Karl
CPSO#:
71089
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alexander Juvshik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Access Services Canada Inc
www.rasci.ca
1-800-971-8038
Date Received: 09 Aug 2019
Instructions/Address:
Records Access Services Canada
854 Upper Canada Dr
Sarnia ON N7W 1A4
Date Received: 15 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2019 |