THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 9:53:20 AM
Cummings, Michael Bernard George
CPSO#:
71070
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BERNARD GEORGE CUMMINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINGS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2003 to 13 Jul 2004
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2003 |