THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:28:12 AM
Rajan, Poonam
CPSO#:
71057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319-1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 502-1000
Fax: (416) 502-1030
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. POONAM RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 May 1997 to 13 Jun 1997
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2001 |