THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:51:16 PM
Haebe, Jeffrey John
CPSO#:
71040
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Haebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Apr 1997 to 07 May 1997
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1998 to 11 Feb 1998
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 1999 to 13 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 May 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2022 |